Wong, Kwong Wai Raimond (CPSO#: 64611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: 905-575-6326
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Raimond Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wong ( CPSO# 64611 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 387-9495

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KWONG WAI RAIMOND WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1995