Wong, Linda Yee (CPSO#: 62124)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
404 Health Centre
Unit 46
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2
Phone: (905) 868-8330
Fax: (905) 868-8332
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA YEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1991