Wong, Louise Lon Yin (CPSO#: 92173)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Bristol, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
All Med Health
Unit #1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone: (905) 895-9777
Fax: (905) 895-9720
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Louise Lon Yin Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wong ( CPSO# 92173 )

Business Address:
All Med Health
Unit 1
16880 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0A3
Phone Number: (905) 895-9777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOUISE LON YIN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 12 Jan 2010 to 19 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 20 Oct 2010 to 19 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011