Wong, Margaret Mary (CPSO#: 80160)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Insitute of Medicine I, Rangoon, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2003 to 25 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2003 to 22 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Aug 2004