Wong, Michelle Mon Yee (CPSO#: 91988)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Aug 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2009