Wong, Nathan Doan-Kuen (CPSO#: 80708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Healthcare
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wong-Chu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Wong ( CPSO# 80708 )
Dr. J. Chu ( CPSO# 80706 )

Business Address:
Halton Healthcare Services
Milton District Hospital
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
2 - 2510 Hampshire Gate
Oakville ON  L6H 6A2
Phone Number: (905) 901-1882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN DOAN-KUEN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2006