Wong, Philip Kar Fai (CPSO#: 94201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H U M
Dept of Radio Oncologie
1055, rue Sanguinet
Pavillon C
Montreal QC  H2L 4M1
Phone: (514) 890-8254

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP KAR FAI WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2013