Wong, Philip (CPSO#: 71901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
Division of Gastroenterology
McGill University
1001 Blvd. Decarie, room D02.3312
Montreal QC  H4A 3J1
Phone: (514) 934-1934 Ext. 53333
Fax: (514) 843-1421

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1997 to 26 Sep 1997
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2001 to 24 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2004