Wong, Samuel Yeung Shan (CPSO#: 75777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Taiwanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4/F, Lek Yuen Health Centre
9 Lek Yuen Street
Shatin, New Territories N/A
Hong Kong S A R
Phone: 852-22528774

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Hong Kong S A R

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jul 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMUEL YEUNG SHAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Dec 2000 to 09 Jan 2001
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2001