Wong, Sarah Hew-Ming (CPSO#: 77681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 507
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 289-3200
Fax: (416) 289-3220
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 77681 )

Business Address:
507 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-3200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 14 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH HEW-MING WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)