Wong, Sian Eunice (CPSO#: 74836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone: (416) 469-6464 Ext. 2
Fax: (416) 699-7766
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sian Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Wong ( CPSO# 74836 )

Business Address:
1871 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1J3
Phone Number: (416) 699-7775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIAN EUNICE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2002