Wong, Tiffany Mei-Ling (CPSO#: 94362)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 30 Aug 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 02 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Jan 2014 to 14 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2014