Wong, Winnie Tsui-Han (CPSO#: 79490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical and Urgent Care
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: 905-773-7759
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 5
1310 Don Mills Rd.
North York ON  M3B 2W6
Canada
Phone: 905-855-1860
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

465 Garyray Dr.
Toronto ON  M9L 1P7
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. WTH Wong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Wong ( CPSO# 79490 )

Business Address:
KMH Labs
Suite 101
50 Minthorn Boulevard
Markham ON  L3T 7X8

Business Address:
KMH Labs
Suite 5
1310 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3B 2W6

Business Address:
Suite 100
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6

Business Address:
465 Garyray Drive
Toronto ON  M9L 1P7
Phone Number: (416) 749-9300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINNIE TSUI-HAN WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006