Wong-Chong, Nathalie (CPSO#: 95674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 611
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-4448
Fax: (905) 853-7411
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thornhill Endoscopy Clinic
390 Steeles Avenue West
Unit 11 & 12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 882-6566
Fax: (905) 882-6567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE WONG-CHONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG-CHONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017