Woo, Glenn Malcolm (CPSO#: 60021)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4047
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Radiology Associates Etobicoke
85 The East Mall, Lower Level 01
Etobicoke ON
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 621-3961
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Imaging Centre - Albion
1525 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G5
Canada
Phone: 416 741 5661
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Clarkson Radiology
1020 Johnson's Lane
Mississauga ON  L5V 2V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 822-9671
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Radiology Associates Mississauga
3025 Hurontario Street, Suite 402
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1
Canada
Phone: (905) 896-2900
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Radiology Associates Rexdale
123 Rexdale Boulevard, Unit 6
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1P1
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-3828
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Radiology Associates Dundix
1370 Dundas St. East, Suite 302
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-3369
Fax: (416) 231-4103
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn M. Woo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Woo ( CPSO# 60021 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - West Toronto
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Clarkson
1020 Johnson's Lane
Building C
Mississauga ON  L5J 2P7

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Mississauga
402 - 3025 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2H1

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Dundix
302 - 1370 Dundas Street West
Mississauga ON  L4Y 4G4

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Rexdale
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Unit 6
Etobicoke ON  M9W 1P1

Business Address:
Radiology Associates Etobicoke
LF01
85 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W4
Phone Number: (416) 621-3961

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENN MALCOLM WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1994