Woo, Stanley Kwong-Chee (CPSO#: 19218)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1 Fax: 416-398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017