Woo, Tricia Kar Wing (CPSO#: 73563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Peter's Hospital
88 Maplewood Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 777-3837 Ext. 12405
Fax: (905) 526-2062
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRICIA KAR WING WOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2003