Wood, David Alexander (CPSO#: 69249)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre Emerg Dept
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6115
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Wood Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ALEXANDER WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jan 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1998