Wood, Kristi Sue (CPSO#: 95347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart St
Victory 3-3-105
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-549-6666 Ext. 3351
Fax: 613-548-2390
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTI SUE WOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2016 to 31 Jul 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016