Woodland, James Paul (CPSO#: 73505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
PO Box 430
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Woodland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Woodland ( CPSO# 73505 )

Business Address:
Beamsville Medical Centre
P.O. Box 430
4279 Hixon Road
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
4024 23rd Street
Vineland ON  L0R 2C0
Phone Number: (905) 562-7385

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES PAUL WOODLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001