Woods, Si-Ann Helen Lee (CPSO#: 72792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue A6
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4581
Fax: (613) 761-5328
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheridan-Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Sheridan ( CPSO# 71119 )
Dr. S. Woods ( CPSO# 72792 )

Business Address:
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone Number: (613) 979-0969

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue Room A6
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SI-ANN HELEN LEE WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003