Woods, Terence Christopher Hendrick (CPSO#: 84566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Arnprior & District Memorial Hosp
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: 613-623-3166
Fax: 613-623-2430
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton Place & District
Memorial Hospital
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Woods Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Woods ( CPSO# 84566 )

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6

Business Address:
Carleton Place & District
Memorial Hospital
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERENCE CHRISTOPHER HENDRICK WOODS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOODS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Apr 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2008