Wooller, Krista Rae (CPSO#: 79327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
D107c
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4473
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTA RAE WOOLLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2008