Woolner, Douglas Sidney (CPSO#: 55940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Queen Street East
Suite 215
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 946-1332
Fax: (705) 946-5113
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Willett Woolner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woolner ( CPSO# 55940 )
Dr. J. Willett ( CPSO# 53996 )

Business Address:
215 - 955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 946-1332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS SIDNEY WOOLNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986