Wormsbecker, Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 81335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6611
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
Pediatrics Clinic
61 Queen St. East, 2nd Floor
M5C 2T2
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: 416 867 3655
Fax: 416 867 3736
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne E. Wormsbecker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wormsbecker ( CPSO# 81335 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6611

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
2nd Floor
61 Queen Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3655

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Just for Kids Clinic,St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH WORMSBECKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WORMSBECKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008