Wozniak, Miranda Lynn (CPSO#: 84457)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LifeLabs MLS
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 6J6
Phone: (416) 675-4530 Ext. 42040
Fax: (416) 213-4206
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

6560 Kennedy Road
Mississauga ON  L5T 2X4
Canada
Phone: 416-675-4530 Ext. 42040
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ari Bay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wozniak ( CPSO# 84457 )
Dr. A. Bay ( CPSO# 81455 )

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIRANDA LYNN WOZNIAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOZNIAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010