Wray, Rebecca Susanne (CPSO#: 86630)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone: (905) 985-2895 Ext. 5420
Fax: (844) 282-8549
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Gauster Schurter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Adams ( CPSO# 72364 )
Dr. J. Ross ( CPSO# 88724 )
Dr. H. Nguyen ( CPSO# 88893 )
Dr. A. Armstrong ( CPSO# 84261 )
Dr. A. Dayal ( CPSO# 79055 )
Dr. A. Gauster ( CPSO# 100273)
Dr. A. Pawley ( CPSO# 87461 )
Dr. S. Shepherd ( CPSO# 71354 )
Dr. J. Moran ( CPSO# 100903)
Dr. A. Bruno ( CPSO# 101160)
Dr. C. Hadden ( CPSO# 100522)
Dr. T. Stryde ( CPSO# 73931 )
Dr. F. Ali ( CPSO# 76181 )
Dr. M. Schurter ( CPSO# 82718 )
Dr. R. Allin ( CPSO# 20746 )
Dr. S. Russell ( CPSO# 60638 )
Dr. J. Tuck ( CPSO# 64782 )
Dr. A. Chiella ( CPSO# 74700 )
Dr. S. Cull ( CPSO# 82751 )
Dr. S. Hyshka ( CPSO# 67972 )
Dr. F. Nasser-Sharif ( CPSO# 72700 )
Dr. C. Westbrook ( CPSO# 89258 )
Dr. D. Wang ( CPSO# 90666 )
Dr. B. Tse ( CPSO# 91489 )
Dr. P. Puckrin ( CPSO# 27488 )
Dr. M. Stewart ( CPSO# 62187 )
Dr. G. Mercer ( CPSO# 60472 )
Dr. A. Brown ( CPSO# 59455 )
Dr. M. Gilmour ( CPSO# 59725 )
Dr. R. Wray ( CPSO# 86630 )
Dr. K. Ferguson ( CPSO# 76506 )
Dr. K. Best ( CPSO# 75245 )
Dr. M. Brown ( CPSO# 69023 )
Dr. N. Kazarian ( CPSO# 71482 )
Dr. E. Russell ( CPSO# 59302 )

Business Address:
Medical Associates of Port Perry
462 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-2895

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jan 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA SUSANNE WRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 01 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2010