Wright, Kelley Marie (CPSO#: 71149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
489 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 9E4
Phone: (705) 739-5262
Fax: (705) 739-5263
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bob Rumball Home for the Deaf
1 Royal Parkside Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 0T4
Canada
Phone: (705) 719-6700
Fax: (705) 719-6701
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

78 Ross St.
Barrie ON  L4N 1G3
Canada
Phone: 705 792-3503
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Leacock Care Centre
25 Museum Drive
Orillia ON  L3V 7T9
Canada
Phone: 705 325-9181
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Muskoka Landing
65 Rogers Cove Dr.
Huntsville ON  P1H 2L9
Canada
Phone: 705 789-7713
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelley Wright Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wright ( CPSO# 71149 )

Business Address:
101 - 489 Essa Road
Barrie ON  L4N 9E4
Phone Number: (705) 739-5262

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLEY MARIE WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1999