Wronzberg, Jordan Samuel Adam (CPSO#: 95884)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: 905-689-5772
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Nemo Christian Nursing Home
4486 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 0N2
Canada
Phone: 905-335-3636
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Wronzberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. O'Connor ( CPSO# 96128 )
Dr. J. Wronzberg ( CPSO# 95884 )

Business Address:
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-3301

Business Address:
Mount Nemo Christian Nursing Home
4486 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 0N2
Phone Number: (905) 335-3636

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN SAMUEL ADAM WRONZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRONZBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014