Wu Chao Ying, Valerie (CPSO#: 93652)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
726 Upper James St
Toronto ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone: (905) 575-5743
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Wu Chao Ying Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wu Chao Ying ( CPSO# 93652 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
40 Holly Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE WU CHAO YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU CHAO YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2016