Wu, Melinda Yung-Shen (CPSO#: 91703)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B6
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. +1+4
Fax: (416) 323-6402
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Breast Centre, 2nd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 946-2297
Fax: (416) 946-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melinda Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 91703 )

Business Address:
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Breast Centre 2nd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2297

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINDA YUNG-SHEN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011