Wu, Peter Eugene (CPSO#: 93134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room 14-206
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3155
Fax: 416-595-5826
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wu ( CPSO# 93134 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room 14-216A
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4059

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER EUGENE WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014