Wu, Yan (CPSO#: 93159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Mudanjiang Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone: (613) 224-6606
Fax: (613) 224-6162
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yan Wu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Wu ( CPSO# 93159 )

Business Address:
College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2012