Wu, You (CPSO#: 95971)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Calgary, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
Room B4 401
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6H 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 17907
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Yu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Yu ( CPSO# 95295 )
Dr. Y. Wu ( CPSO# 95971 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2958

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YOU WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016