Wurtele, Patika Anne (CPSO#: 61091)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wurtele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015