Wyatt, Emma Louise (CPSO#: 91500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main St W, HSC 2N49I
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sulowski Wyatt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sulowski ( CPSO# 84710 )
Dr. E. Wyatt ( CPSO# 91500 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Emma  Louise  Wyatt  may  practise  medicine  independently  in paediatric
            emergency medicine.