Wyman, Michael David (CPSO#: 22475)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 1969

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1969

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 305
Willowdale ON  M2K 2W1
Phone: (416) 223-4802
Fax: (416) 223-0427
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1971 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID WYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1969

Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: June 13, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

On June 13, 2018, the Quality Assurance Committee (“QAC”) required family medicine physician, Dr. Michael Wyman, to complete a specified continuing education and remediation program (“SCERP”). The SCERP requires Dr. Wyman to:

• Attend and provide proof of successful completion of the following course:
o CMPA Modules on Medical Records

• Practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months;

• Review the following policies, guidelines or tools with reference to how each is applicable to family medicine:

o Review of Ontario Immunization Schedule
o Review of Choosing Wisely Guidelines – Family Medicine
o Review and discussion of Canadian Task Force on Periodic Health Exams
o Review and discussion of CPSO Medical Records Policy
o Review and discussion of CPSO Consent to Treatment Policy

• Undergo a reassessment with an assessor selected by the College, approximately 6 months following the completion of the Education Plan.