Wyne, Ahraaz (CPSO#: 92922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Center
1200 Main Street West
HSC 3V 39
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76992
Fax: 905-524-5500
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Wyne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wyne ( CPSO# 92922 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
1200 Main Street West
Suite 3V 39
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHRAAZ WYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014