Wysynski, Anna-Marie (CPSO#: 72713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2400 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7P 4N3
Phone: (289) 812-2190
Fax: 8665468706
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

556 Bryne Dr #16
Barrie, ON
Barrie ON  L4N 9P6
Canada
Phone: (705) 241-8745
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 768-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

29 Noxon Road
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA-MARIE WYSYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYSYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2003
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008