Xenocostas, Anargyros (CPSO#: 72762)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:McGill University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Hematology
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E6-215A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58631
Fax: (519) 685-8477
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Xenocostas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Xenocostas ( CPSO# 72762 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences
Room E6-215A
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 09 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANARGYROS XENOCOSTAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XENOCOSTAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000