Xing, Jerry Guangyu (CPSO#: 93230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Frederick St
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone: 7055581700
Fax: 7054820680
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerry Xing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Xing ( CPSO# 93230 )

Business Address:
41 Frederick Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5W6
Phone Number: (705) 558-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY GUANGYU XING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015