Xu, Haibo (CPSO#: 84946)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Beijing Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Haldimand Family Health Team
Dunnville Site
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1T1
Phone: (905) 774-7541
Fax: (905) 774-4310
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Haibo Xu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Xu ( CPSO# 84946 )
Dr. L. Ren ( CPSO# 90805 )

Business Address:
Haldimand Family Health Team
Dunnville Site
334 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 1T1
Phone Number: (905) 774-7541

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAIBO XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008