Xu, Shuang (CPSO#: 92843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone: (519) 824-1010 Ext. 2724
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shuang Xu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xu ( CPSO# 92843 )

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUANG XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016