Yacowar, Mayer (CPSO#: 70982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hebrew

Education:McGill University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Central Clinics
2202 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone: (416) 614-7999
Fax: (416) 614-7998
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Yacowar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yacowar ( CPSO# 70982 )

Business Address:
Central Clinics
2202 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M3M 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 614-7999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYER YACOWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YACOWAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1997
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 May 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 May 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 2, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)