Yadava, Anurag (CPSO#: 92331)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Gandhi Medical College, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2010 to 15 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Anaesthesia

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2010