Yaghini, Reza (CPSO#: 90913)

Current Status: Suspended as of 02 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
102 - 480 Huronia St
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 725-7716
Fax: (705) 792-0966
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yaghini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Yaghini ( CPSO# 90913 )

Business Address:
480 Huronia Road
Suite 102
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 725-7716

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2017
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2017
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 02 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2017
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Registration Status: Suspended     Effective From: 02 May 2018


Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Discipline Committee Effective: 02 May 2018 Active

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 13 Feb 2017
Summary:

On February 13, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Yaghini committed an act 
of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practise 
of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Yaghini is a family doctor who currently provides locum services to emergency 
departments in various hospitals in Ontario. 

At the relevant time, Dr. Yaghini practised in association with a group of physicians in a 
Family Health Group (the “Group”), in Thornbury, Ontario. The Group was composed of a 
number of physicians, including Dr. X and Dr. Yaghini. At the relevant time, Dr. Yaghini 
also had privileges at the Grey Bruce Health Services, (“the hospital”). Dr. Yaghini had 
access to the hospital’s electronic medical records system (“EMR”). Personal medical 
records pertaining to Dr. X were stored in the hospital’s EMR. 

In the period preceding the events at issue in this hearing, the personal and professional 
relationship between Dr. X and Dr. Yaghini had deteriorated and become very poor. On 
September 17, 2014, the Chief of Staff of the hospital contacted the College to advise that 
the hospital had determined that Dr. Yaghini had accessed Dr. X’s personal health records 
through the hospital’s EMR, on June 9, 2013. The access by Dr. Yaghini was in breach of 
the hospital’s policy on access to personal health information. Dr. Yaghini was not 
authorized to view Dr. X’s personal health records. 

Dr. Yaghini acknowledged that he had no justification for viewing the personal health 
records of Dr. X. Effective November 29, 2014, Dr. Yaghini agreed to voluntarily resign 
his privileges at the hospital at the request of the Chief of Staff. 

Dr. Yaghini’s explanation for viewing the personal health records of Dr. X is that, in the 
context of their deteriorating relationship, Dr. Yaghini accessed the record because of his 
perception of ongoing bullying and harassing behaviour by Dr. X towards him. This 
perception caused Dr. Yaghini to be concerned about his well-being and to question 
whether Dr. X might have a health issue that was motivating Dr. X’s behaviour towards 
him.  For this reason, Dr. Yaghini decided to access Dr. X’s personal health records.  

On January 29, 2015, Dr. Yaghini completed a course titled, “Patient confidentiality and 
disclosing information”. 
 
Disposition  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Yaghini’s Certificate of Registration for a three (3) month 
   period effective April 2, 2017 at midnight (12:00 a.m.). 
-  the Registrar to impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr.  Yaghini’s 
   certificate of registration: 
    (i)  At his own expense, Dr. Yaghini shall participate in and successfully complete, 
         within six (6) months of the date of this Order, individualized instruction in 
                                     
 
         medical ethics satisfactory to the College, with an instructor selected by the 
         College.  The instructor shall provide a summative report to the College 
         including his or her conclusion about whether the instruction was completed 
         successfully by Dr. Yaghini. 
-  Dr. Yaghini appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr.  Yaghini to  pay  costs  to  the  College  for  a  one  day  hearing  in  the  amount  of 
   $5,000.00 within 30 days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Feb 13, 2017


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Dec 2016
Summary:

On December 21, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Reza Yaghini committed an act of professional misconduct in that he 
engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient and has engaged in conduct or an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Yaghini is a family physician who practised at a community health centre and a hospital’s 
emergency department. 
 
Patient A, a teenage girl, had received an antibiotic from a doctor at the local hospital for a 
kidney infection in April 2012. She then developed an allergic reaction consisting of swelling 
and redness around her eye, and a rash on her stomach, back, neck and chest.  
 
Since her parents were out of town, and her family doctor’s office was far away, a family friend 
took Patient A to the Emergency Department of the hospital. Dr. Yaghini saw Patient A in the 
examination room of the hospital alone. The Committee found that Dr. Yaghini made a comment 
to Patient A during this examination at the hospital that she was pretty or very pretty. Patient A 
was discharged home with a different antibiotic prescription and instructions to return either to 
her family doctor, the Emergency Department, or Dr. Yaghini’s clinic if she had further 
problems.  
 
After this, Patient A again developed a rash on her stomach, neck, chest, back, and possibly her 
face. She made an appointment to see Dr. Yaghini at his clinic in April 2012. She attended there 
with a friend, who waited outside the waiting room. Dr. Yaghini examined Patient A at his clinic 
that day. 
 
The Committee found that Dr. Yaghini made a similar comment to the “pretty” or “very pretty” 
remark to Patient A at her second appointment with him.  
 
The Committee also found that, at this second appointment, Dr. Yaghini came close to Patient A 
and kissed her on the cheek. Then, with his hands on her face and jaw, the Committee found that 
Dr. Yaghini tried to kiss Patient A on the lips. This resulted in her feeling scared and 
uncomfortable as she said she felt, and led to the series of events that followed. 
 
The Committee further found that Dr. Yaghini’s kiss on Patient A’s cheek and his attempted kiss 
on her lips constitute sexual abuse. The Committee concluded that it is obvious that kissing the 
cheek and then attempting to kiss the lips of a teenage girl in the context of a medical 
examination is a sexual act that violated the sexual integrity of the victim.  
 
The Committee further found that during the second April 2012 appointment, Dr. Yaghini told 
Patient A that she reminded him of a woman he had dated or an ex-girlfriend, and, after the 
attempted kiss on Patient A’s lips when Dr. Yaghini apologized to her, he told her he was 
excited. The Committee found that these comments constitute sexual abuse, being behaviour or 
remarks of a sexual nature by the member towards the patient. The Committee also found the 
making of these remarks to a teenage patient in private during a medical examination to be 
conduct relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
PENALTY  
 
On March 29, 2017, the Discipline Committee reserved its decision on penalty. On 
June 20, 2017, the Discipline Committee released its decision on penalty and ordered 
that: 
 
-  the Registrar suspend Dr. Yaghini’s certificate of registration for a period of nine 
   months, to commence on the date this decision is released; 
-  the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
   Yaghini’s certificate of registration: 
      a) Dr. Yaghini attend the Understanding Boundaries Course in London, 
         Ontario within six months of the date of this Order; and 
      b) Dr. Yaghini participate in a counselling program acceptable to the 
         College to consist of counselling once per month, for a period of one 
         year, which includes enhancing of insight, identification of any at-risk 
         situations and prevention of circumstances that could put him at risk in 
         the future. 
-  Dr. Yaghini appear before the Committee to be reprimanded within 30 days of 
   the date this Order becomes final; 
-  Dr. Yaghini reimburse the College for funding provided to Patient A under the 
   program required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall post an irrevocable 
   letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College to guarantee payment 
   of such amounts within 30 days of the date of this Order, in the amount of 
   $16,060.00; 
-  Dr. Yaghini pay costs to the College in the amount of $31,500.00, within 30 
   days of the date of this Order becomes final. 
 
APPEAL 
 
On January 19, 2017, Dr. Yaghini appealed the decision on finding of the Discipline Committee 
to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s.25(1) of the Statutory Powers 
Procedure Act, the appeal operated as a stay of the decision pending the outcome of the appeal. 
On April 18, 2018, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Yaghini’s appeal. Therefore, the decision 
of the Discipline Committee is in effect.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing Dates: July 25 - 27, 2016 Penalty Hearing Dates: March 27-29, 2017