Yahyavi, Pooneh (CPSO#: 73280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Feb 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pooneh Yahyavi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yahyavi ( CPSO# 73280 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. POONEH YAHYAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAHYAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Jan 1999 to 24 Jan 2000
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2000