Yakoub, Emad Iskander (CPSO#: 78891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Mar 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: Costin Yakoub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Costin ( CPSO# 76323 )
Dr. E. Yakoub ( CPSO# 78891 )

Business Address:
Grand River Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Business Address:
2 Rivers Family Health Team Clinic
B12-350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7
Phone Number: (519) 629-4615

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Yukon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMAD ISKANDER YAKOUB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAKOUB is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2003