Yakub, Abu Mohammed (CPSO#: 87954)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2018

Expiry Date:  01 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Farsi, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Dhaka, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
184 Clarence Street
Brampton ON  L6W 1T3
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9-7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Canada
Phone: 9054555445
Fax: 9054555665
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abu M. Yakub Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yakub ( CPSO# 87954 )

Business Address:
Suite 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 455-5445

Business Address:
184 Clarence Street
Brampton ON  L6W 1T3
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2018
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Abu  Mohammed  Yakub  may  practise family medicine, while under the
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor  acceptable to the College at the
                  following locations:

                  (i)   184 Clarence Street in Brampton, Ontario; 
                  
                  (ii)  537 Van Kirk Drive in Brampton, Ontario; and

                  (iii) 7990 Kennedy Road South in Brampton, Ontario.

            2.    The certificate of registration will automatically  expire  on January 1,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Yakub's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Yakub's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Yakub's practice unsatisfactory. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April  27, 2018, and will expire on or
                  before January 1, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.