Yamashiro, Hirotaka (CPSO#: 66514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yamashiro Pediatric Clinic
2409 Yonge Street
Unit 302
Toronto ON  M4P 2E7
Phone: (647) 352-7337
Fax: (647) 351-7334
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HIROTAKA YAMASHIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMASHIRO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1998